EP1880292 - COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRE-EMPTIVE SERVICE AND IMPROVED USE OF SERVICE RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power-One Renewable Energy Solutions, LLC 740 Calle Plano Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2011/20] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Fat Spaniel Technologies, Inc. 2 West Santa Clara Street 5 Floor San Jose CA 95113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEKHUIS, Christiaan 648 South 12th Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06751904.1 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US16442 | Priority number, date | US20050676390P | 29.04.2005 Original published format: US 676390 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006119108 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880292 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05D11/00, G06F11/30, G06Q10/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06393 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E40/70 (EP,US);
Y04S10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR PRÄEMPTIVEN DIENST UND VERBESSERTE NUTZUNG VON DIENSTBETRIEBSMITTELN | [2008/04] | English: | COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRE-EMPTIVE SERVICE AND IMPROVED USE OF SERVICE RESOURCES | [2008/04] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR FOURNIR UN SERVICE PRIORITAIRE ET L'UTILISATION AMELIOREE DES RESSOURCES DU SERVICE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002059412 (AZPITARTE JEAN-PATRICK [FR]) [A] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * figure 4a ** paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0015] , [0027] , [0062] - [0065] *; | [A]US2003005107 (DULBERG ADI [US], et al) [A] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0173] - [0177] - [0184] , [0188] , [0242] - [0247] - [0250] , [0292] *; | [I]US2004230377 (GHOSH SOUMEN [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0040] , [0041] , [0043] , [0045] , [0061] , [0062] *; | [I]GB2405492 (DISTANT CONTROL LTD [GB]) [I] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * figure 6 * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 15 * * page 17, line 9 - page 18, line l * * page 22, line 19 - page 25, line 13 * | International search | [A]US6519730 (ANDO HISASHIGE [JP], et al); | [A]US2003115251 (FREDRICKSON JASON A [US], et al); | [A]US2004143428 (RAPPAPORT THEODORE S [US], et al); | [A]US2004163011 (SHAW JEFF ALTON [US]); | [A]US2004205403 (MARKOW MITCHELL [US], et al); | [A]US2005229039 (ANDERSON GARY D [US], et al) |