EP1879740 - GEOPOLYMER COMPOSITES AND STRUCTURES FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated One Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEALL, George, H. 16 Woodland Drive Big Flats, New York 14814 / US | 02 /
PINCKNEY, Linda, R. 1560 Caton Road Corning, New York 14830 / US | 03 /
TEPESCH, Patrick, D. 179 Watauga Avenue Corning, New York 14830 / US | 04 /
TIETJE, Steven, A. 9769 Church Creek Road Lindley, New York 14858 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752287.0 | 02.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US17337 | Priority number, date | US20050126083 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: US 126083 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006121823 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879740 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/00, C04B35/195, C04B35/63, C04B38/00, B01D46/24 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B32B13/04 (EP,US);
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B13/02 (EP,US);
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
C03C14/004 (EP,US);
C04B28/008 (EP,US);
C04B35/18 (EP,US);
C04B35/19 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/447 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5077 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,US);
B32B2307/702 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
B32B2307/726 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,US);
C03C2214/32 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3472 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/008, C04B14/047, C04B14/06, C04B14/30, C04B14/366, C04B22/0013, C04B40/0268 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/195, C04B38/0006 (US,EP);
C04B41/5077, C04B41/5024 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/44] | C04B33/00, B01D24/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/04] | B32B13/04, B32B19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEOPOLYMERVERBUNDSTOFFE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE STRUKTUREN | [2008/04] | English: | GEOPOLYMER COMPOSITES AND STRUCTURES FORMED THEREFROM | [2008/04] | French: | COMPOSITES GEOPOLYMERES ET STRUCTURES FORMEES A PARTIR DE CES DERNIERS | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 10.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | 01.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US4472199 (DAVIDOVITS JOSEPH [FR]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 7; examples 1,2 * [Y] 3,6,8; | [Y]EP0550332 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]) [Y] 3,8 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 45 - line 51 * * column 6, lines 17-21 *; | [XY]US5352427 (DAVIDOVITS JOSEPH [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 8, line 40 - line 55; claim 15 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 6 * * column 3, line 59 - line 60 * [Y] 3; | [A]EP0633231 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]) [A] 1-8* page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 51 *; | [Y]FR2738164 (CAMFIL [FR]) [Y] 6 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 22 *; | [Y] - DAVIDOVITS J ET AL, "GEOPOLYMER INORGANIC RESINS THEIR USES IN THE COMPOSITE INDUSTRY", COMPOSITES.PLASTIQUES RENFORCES FIBRES DE VERRE TEXTILE, CENTRE DOC. VERRE TEXTILE PLAS RE. PARIS, FR, (19910301), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0754-0876, pages 76 - 89, XP000319127 [Y] 6 * page 81; figures 5,10 * | [X] - DAVIDOVITS J ET AL, "GEOPOLYMER: ULTRA-HIGH TEMPERATURE TOOLING MATERIAL FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF ADVANCED COMPOSITES", INTERNATIONAL SAMPE SYMPOSIUM AND EXHIBITION, XX, XX, (19910415), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 1939 - 1949, XP000571780 [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1940 - page 1942; figures 4,5 * | International search | [X]US4472199 (DAVIDOVITS JOSEPH [FR]); | [Y]WO2005019130 (NICHOLSON CATHERINE LOUISE [NZ], et al); | [Y]US2002010073 (BEALL DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [Y]US6464744 (CUTLER WILLARD A [US], et al) |