EP2021311 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF POLYPHENOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Badger Licensing LLC One Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FETSKO, Stephen, W. 33 Woodlock Road Hingham, Massachusetts 02043 / US | 02 /
EVITT, Steven, D. 34 Josephine Avenue Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752299.5 | 04.05.2006 | [2009/07] | WO2006US17360 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007130040 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021311 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021311 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/20 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
C07C37/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C37/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYPHENOLEN | [2009/07] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF POLYPHENOLS | [2009/07] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE FABRICATION DE POLYPHENOLS | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2006 | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | LV | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | GB | 04.05.2012 | IE | 04.05.2012 | LU | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
GB | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
LU | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
GB | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
GB | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
GB | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 10.08.2011 | |
IS | 10.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6323830 ; | [A]US2602821 (LUTEN JR DANIEL B, et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 24 - line 63; claim - *; | [A]EP0112615 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]WO02059069 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [DX]WO02083611 (RESOLUTION RES NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [DX] 1-40 * claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 10, Database accession no. 1988-068404, XP002414994 & JPS6323830 A 19880201 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |