EP1891766 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE DEVICE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certicom Corp. 4701 Tahoe Boulevard Tahoe A, 6th Floor Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Certicom Corp. 5520 Explorer Drive, 4th Floor Mississauga Ontario L4W 5L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEILL, Brian 2135 Donald Road Burlington, Ontario L7M 3R3 / CA | 02 /
VADEKAR, Ashok R.R. 4 250 Harris Street Rockwood, Ontario N0B 2K0 / CA | 03 /
XU, Patrick 21 Greyfriars Avenue Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 4R4 / CA | 04 /
WALTERS, Anthony J. 57 Sanderson Cr Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 5L5 / CA | 05 /
ROSATI, Tony 167 Grandview Road Ottawa, Ontario K2H 8B8 / CA | [2013/18] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
NEILL, Brian 2135 Donald Road Burlington, Ontario L7M 3R3 / CA | ||
02 /
VADEKAR, Ashok R.R. 4250 Harris Street Rockwood, Ontario N0B 2K0 / CA | |||
03 /
XU, Patrick 21 Greyfriars Avenue Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 4R4 / CA | |||
04 /
WALTERS, Anthony J. 57 Sanderson Cr Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 5L5 / CA | |||
05 /
ROSATI, Tony 167 Grandview Road Ottawa, Ontario K2H 8B8 / CA | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2010/06] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752780.4 | 12.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006CA00944 | Priority number, date | US20050690155P | 14.06.2005 Original published format: US 690155 P | CA20052510366 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: CA 2510366 | US20060777262P | 28.02.2006 Original published format: US 777262 P | CA20062538087 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: CA 2538087 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006133545 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891766 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1891766 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/28, H04L29/06, G06F21/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G06F21/72 (EP,US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L9/0897 (EP,US);
H04L2209/04 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
H04L2463/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/09] | H04L9/00, H04L9/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERNEINRICHTUNGSREGISTRATION | [2008/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE DEVICE REGISTRATION | [2008/09] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DISPOSITIF A DISTANCE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 13.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2006 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | ES | 11.09.2013 | IT | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.06.2006 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002023217 (WHEELER LYNN HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-38* paragraph [0002] *; | [I]WO2004040397 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-38 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 18; claim 32 * * page 7, lines 10-20 * | International search | [X]US2003182435 (REDLICH RON M [US], et al); | [A]US2002010679 (FELSHER DAVID PAUL [US]); | [A]US2005131900 (PALLIYLL SUDARSHAN [IN], et al) | Examination | US2005021962 | by applicant | WO2004040397 | US2002023217 |