EP1902515 - DIELECTRIC POLYMER ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Victhom Human Bionics Inc. 4780, rue Saint-Félix, Bureau 105 Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures Québec G3A 2J9 / CA | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEDARD, Stephane 256 du Tonnelier, Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures Quebec G3A 2K5 / CA | 02 /
CREVIER, Marie-Charlotte 891 Cartier Québec, Québec G1R 2R8 / CA | 03 /
ROY, Pierre-Olivier 1242 Allard Sainte-Foy, Québec G1W 3G1 / CA | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752865.3 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006CA01093 | Priority number, date | US20050695001P | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 695001 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003048 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902515 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02N2/02, A61F2/70, A61F2/48 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/50 (EP);
H02N2/02 (EP);
H10N30/05 (EP);
H10N30/506 (EP);
A61F2/6607 (EP);
A61F2002/5066 (EP);
H10N30/857 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHES POLYMER-STELLGLIED | [2008/13] | English: | DIELECTRIC POLYMER ACTUATOR | [2008/13] | French: | ACTIVATEUR POLYMÈRE DIÉLECTRIQUE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 15.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002175598 (HEIM JON [US], et al); | [Y]US2004008853 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al); | [X]US2004217671 (ROSENTHAL MARCUS A [US], et al) |