EP1891357 - PACKING SEAL AND PISTON COMPRISING SUCH A PACKING SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helpap, Hans Ludwigstrasse 26 85652 Pliening / DE | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Am Rurufer 2 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Petra, Elke, et al Petra & Kollegen Patentanwälte Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 18 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | Application number, filing date | 06753180.6 | 18.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006DE00864 | Priority number, date | DE20051024140 | 23.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005024140 | [2008/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006125416 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891357 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/16, F16J9/18 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
F16J9/16 (EP,US);
F16J9/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTPAKET UND HUBKOLBEN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN PAKET | [2008/09] | English: | PACKING SEAL AND PISTON COMPRISING SUCH A PACKING SEAL | [2008/09] | French: | GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE ET PISTON ALTERNATIF MUNI D'UNE TELLE GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 24.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0937216 (HELPAP HANS [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE523160 (PERCIVAL TURNER HOUSTON) [DA] 1-14 * page 3, lines 2-10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE491533 (TORKILD VALDEMAR HEMMINGSEN) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 51-66 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO9514184 | EP0937216 | US2055153 | US2590961 | DE523160 | GB2131121 | EP0987216 |