EP1901620 - PHOSPHATIDYLSERINE ENRICHED MILK FRACTIONS FOR THE FORMULATION OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arla Foods Amba Sønderhøj 14 8260 Viby J / DK | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Arla Foods Amba Skanderborgvej 277 8260 Viby J / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURLING, Hans c/o Arla, Foods Amba Skanderborgvej 277 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Ingemar c/o Arla Foods amba Skanderborgvej 277 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael Kr. Kausch-Strasse 26 D-67251 Freinsheim / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
BURLING, Hans c/o Arla, Foods Amba Skanderborgvej 277 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | ||
02 /
ANDERSSON, Ingemar c/o Arla Foods amba Skanderborgvej 277 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael Kr. Kausch-Strasse 26 D-67251 Freinsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2020/27] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/14] | Nilausen, Kim, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/02] | Wetke, Ellen, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2008/13] | Wetke, Ellen, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 06753297.8 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006DK00303 | Priority number, date | US20050685527P | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 685527 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006128465 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901620 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901620 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/52, A23G1/30, A23G1/56, A23G9/32, A23L33/105, A23L33/175, A23C13/12, A23J7/00, A61K35/20 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A23G9/32 (EP,US);
A23C9/00 (KR);
A23C13/12 (EP,US);
A23G1/30 (EP,US);
A23G1/56 (EP,US);
A23G9/327 (EP,US);
A23J7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/00 (KR);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/00 (KR);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G1/56, A23G2200/08 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1852 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1852, A23V2200/322 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | A23L2/00, A23J7/00, A23L1/29, A23C9/00, A23G1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 06.12.2007 | BA | 06.12.2007 | HR | 06.12.2007 | MK | 06.12.2007 | YU | 06.12.2007 | Title | German: | PHOSPHATIDYLSERIN-ANGEREICHERTE MILCHFRAKTIONEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FUNKTIONSNAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2020/04] | English: | PHOSPHATIDYLSERINE ENRICHED MILK FRACTIONS FOR THE FORMULATION OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS | [2008/13] | French: | FRACTIONS DE LAIT ENRICHIES EN PHOSPHATIDYLSERINE UTILISEES POUR LA PREPARATION D'ALIMENTS FONCTIONNELS | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/13] | MIT PHOSPHATIDYLSERIN ANGEREICHERTE MILCHFRAKTIONEN ZUR FORMULIERUNG VON FUNCTIONAL FOOD | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2009 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10189578.7 / EP2308324 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2021
31.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.2021
31.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 13.04.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.08.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/18] | 06.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.12.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2006 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | LU | 31.05.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
LU | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
LU | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 01.07.2020 | |
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2003304814 ; | [X]RU2210925 ; | [X]US5591479 (PONROY YVES [FR]) [X] 1,7,8,14,19,20,1,7,8,14,19,20,1,7,8,14,19,20 * column 2, lines 8-31; examples I-IV; claims 1-3 * * column 2, lines 8-31; examples I-IV; claims 1-3 * * column 2, lines 8-31; examples I-IV; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US5677472 (NYBERG LENA [SE], et al) [X] 1,7,8,1,7,8,1,7,8 * examples 1 and 4; figure 2; claims 1-11* * examples 1 and 4; figure 2; claims 1-11* * examples 1 and 4; figure 2; claims 1-11* [Y] 16-18,16-18,16-18; | [X]US2003190392 (HIRATSUKA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,1,1 * embodiments 1 and 2; claims 1, 7 and 8 * * embodiments 1 and 2; claims 1, 7 and 8 * * embodiments 1 and 2; claims 1, 7 and 8 *; | [X]US2004022922 (RUTENBERG DAVID [IL]) [X] 1,7,1,7,1,7 * example 1-1; claims 1, 2, 6 and 7 * * example 1-1; claims 1, 2, 6 and 7 * * example 1-1; claims 1, 2, 6 and 7 *; | [X]US2004234587 (SAMPALIS FOTINI [CA]) [X] 1,6-8,1,6-8,1,6-8 * examples 1, 2, 8-12, 36 and 115-119 * * examples 1, 2, 8-12, 36 and 115-119 * * examples 1, 2, 8-12, 36 and 115-119 *; | [X]WO2005023271 (BIOGHURT BIOGARDE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,13,1,7,13,1,7,13 * examples 1-4; claims 1 and 8-12 * * examples 1-4; claims 1 and 8-12 * * examples 1-4; claims 1 and 8-12 *; | [XP]WO2005099876 (UNIV LAVAL [CA], et al) [XP] 1,2,6,1,2,6,1,2,6 * page 9, lines 10-26; figure 1; claims 1-4 and 8 * * page 9, lines 10-26; figure 1; claims 1-4 and 8 * * page 9, lines 10-26; figure 1; claims 1-4 and 8 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003304814 A 20031028 (FANCL CORP; BIZEN CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,1,1 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 16-18,16-18,16-18 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 67, Database accession no. 2003-706261, XP002395571 & RU2210925 C1 20030827 (TIMOFEENKO T I) [X] 1,7,8,1,7,8,1,7,8 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * | other | US4529611 | US5223299 | WO0234062 | WO2006041316 | - BOYD L.C. ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF WHEY PHOSPHOLIPIDS", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (19991201), vol. 82, no. 12, pages 2550 - 2557, XP000890756 | - MURGIA S. ET AL, "Quantitative Characterization of Phospholipids in Milk Fat via 31P NMR Using a monophasic solvent mixture", LIPIDS, (2003), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 585 - 591, XP003025290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-003-1500-3 | - HELLHAMMER J. ET AL, "Effects of soy lecithin phosphatidic acid and phosphatidylserine complex (PAS) on the endocrine and psychological responses to mental stress", STRESS, (20040601), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 119 - 126, XP009107865 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10253890410001728379 | - NUTTER L.J. ET AL, "Determination of the Molecular Species composition of Bovine Milk Serum Lecithin", J. DAIRY SCIENCE, (19660921), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 298 - 304, XP003025291 | - UPHUS A., "Milk fat processing - Butter and Butteroil / AMF (Anhydrous Milk Fat)", GEA MECHANICAL SEPARATION DIVISION, (19960130), pages 1-3,26 - 53,64, XP003025292 | - "Membrane Filters - Drying - Production of milk powder", ANONYMOUS, Dairy processing handbook, TETRA PAK PROCESSING SYSTEMS, (2003), XP003025293 | Opposition | WO0234062 | WO2006041316 | - A. UPHOS, "Milk fat processing - butter and butteroil/AMF", GEA Mechanical Separation Division, (19960130), pages 1 - 68, XP055795441 |