EP1901955 - A FLOOR PLATE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Handi Mobil A/S Baggeskærvej 48 7400 Herning / DK | [2010/04] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Handi Mobil ApS Industriparken 34b Lind 7400 Herning / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMSEN, Erik Bæktoftvej 15 DK-7400 Herning / DK | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2008/13] | Inspicos A/S European Patent Attorneys Bøge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45 DK-2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 06753330.7 | 03.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006DK00393 | Priority number, date | DK20050000158U | 04.07.2005 Original published format: DK 200500158 U | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003198 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901955 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901955 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B62D25/20 (EP,US);
B62D25/2054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENPLATTE FÜR FAHRZEUG | [2008/13] | English: | A FLOOR PLATE FOR A VEHICLE | [2008/13] | French: | PLAQUE DE PLANCHER POUR UN VEHICULE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | LT | 16.09.2009 | LV | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | IS | 16.01.2010 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | BG | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9717223 (C A B VOERTUIGTECHNIEK N V [NL], et al) [AD] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]GB2344319 (HARDMAN GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO0138127 (HARDMAN GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1495946 (AUTO INTERIEUR BEHEER B V [NL]) [DA] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document * |