EP1888370 - BELT EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trade World One GmbH Waagenstr. 32 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCKNER, Rolf Von-Fraunhofer-Str. 31 42549 Velbert / DE | 02 /
BERGHOFF, Werner Kantstr. 124 42553 Velbert / DE | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Stratmann, Ernst, et al Strücker Weg 14 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Stratmann, Ernst, et al Schadowplatz 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06754063.3 | 02.06.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006EP05262 | Priority number, date | DE20051026964 | 10.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005026964 | [2008/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006131270 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888370 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1888370 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
B60P7/0807 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GURTÖSE | [2008/08] | English: | BELT EYE | [2008/08] | French: | OEILLET | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/08] | OEILLET DE CEINTURE DE SECURITE | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | LV | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3377039 (ALEX HAYES) [X] 1 * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 16; figure - * [Y] 4-6; | [A]DE8618070U (FA. AUGUST THIELE, 5860 ISERLOHN, DE) [A] 2 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3803248 (FA. AUGUST THIELE, 5860 ISERLOHN, DE); | [A]DE29500242U (PLOGMANN KURT [DE]); | [Y]DE29911871U (PETERS FRANK [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * page 4, line 12 - line 14 * * abstract * |