EP1891633 - OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADIY, Alexander c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06755991.4 | 16.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006IB51533 | Priority number, date | EP20050104680 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05104680 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006129213 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1891633 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/0903 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/085 (KR);
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/095 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES SYSTEM | [2008/09] | English: | OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2008/09] | French: | SYSTEME OPTIQUE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4298974 (TSUNODA YOSHITO, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4720825 (KOKADO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3714804 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0441435 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5113378 (KIMURA FUMIO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 3, line 52 - line 61 * * column 6, line 45 - line 47; figures 1,4,6-8 * [Y] 3; | [A]US5210730 (HAYASHI AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5508990 (NAGASAKI TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09161273 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6088308 (JACOBOWITZ LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1113426 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0039]; figure 6 *; | [A]WO2005024798 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [PA]WO2006038154 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - LEE ET AL., JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2004), vol. 43, no. 7B, pages 4912 - 4914 |