EP1908011 - RECONSTRUCTION STABILIZER AND ACTIVE VISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosensors International Group, Ltd. Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM 11 / BM | [2014/18] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Spectrum Dynamics LLC 30 Ramland Road South Orangeburg, NY 10962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSSO, Benny 12 Henri Bergson Street 75801 Rishon-lezion / IL | 02 /
DICHTERMAN, Eli 8a Vitkin Street 34756 Haifa / IL | 03 /
ZIV, Omer 3 Einstein Street 76470 Rechovot / IL | 04 /
BEN-HAIM, Shlomo 6 Kensington Palace Gardens London W8 4QP / GB | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2008/15] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 06756259.5 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006IL00840 | Priority number, date | WO2005IL01173 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/IL2005/001173 | WO2005IL01215 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/IL2005/001215 | WO2006IL00059 | 15.01.2006 Original published format: PCT/IL2006/000059 | WO2006IL00562 | 11.05.2006 Original published format: PCT/IL2006/000562 | IL20050171346 | 10.10.2005 Original published format: IL 17134605 | IL20050172349 | 27.11.2005 Original published format: IL 17234905 | US20050700299P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 700299 P | US20050700317P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 700317 P | US20050700318P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 700318 P | US20050700752P | 20.07.2005 Original published format: US 700752 P | US20050700753P | 20.07.2005 Original published format: US 700753 P | US20050702979P | 28.07.2005 Original published format: US 702979 P | US20050720034P | 26.09.2005 Original published format: US 720034 P | US20050720541P | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 720541 P | US20050720652P | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 720652 P | US20050741440P | 02.12.2005 Original published format: US 741440 P | US20050750287P | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 750287 P | US20050750334P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750334 P | US20050750597P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750597 P | US20060763458P | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 763458 P | US20060799688P | 11.05.2006 Original published format: US 799688 P | US20060800845P | 17.05.2006 Original published format: US 800845 P | US20060800846P | 17.05.2006 Original published format: US 800846 P | US20060816970P | 28.06.2006 Original published format: US 816970 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007010537 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1908011 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908011 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T17/00, G01B5/26, G06K9/36, G01B11/28 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
A61K51/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/02755 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
A61K51/04 (EP,US);
A61K51/0402 (EP,US);
A61K51/0476 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
A61K51/048 (EP,US);
A61K51/0489 (EP,US);
A61K51/0491 (EP,US);
A61K51/1203 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | G06T5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKONSTRUKTIONSSTABILISIERER UND AKTIV-VISION | [2008/17] | English: | RECONSTRUCTION STABILIZER AND ACTIVE VISION | [2008/15] | French: | STABILISEUR DE RECONSTRUCTION ET VISION ACTIVE | [2008/15] |
Former [2008/15] | WIEDERAUFBAUSTABILIZATOR UND AKTIVE VISION | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 30.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2013 | 26.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0887661 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [X] 1,13-18,20-21,28-30,35-37,39-47,55-56,93-95 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 20 *; | [XA] - JINYI QI, ET AL., "Resolution and noise properties of MAP reconstruction for fully 3-D PET", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING IEEE USA, (200005), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 493 - 506, XP002549082 [X] 1-2,20-21,24,28 * page 493, column 2, line 10 - line 21 * * page 495, column 1, paragraph last * [A] 36,45-47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.870259 | [X] - MOORE S C ET AL., "Quantitative multi-detector emission computerized tomography using iterative attenuation compensation", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE USA, (198208), vol. 23, no. 8, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 706 - 714, XP002549083 [X] 1,35 * abstract * * page 707, section "The multi-datector scanner", first paragraph * | [X] - WILSON D W ET AL, "Non-stationary noise characteristics for SPECT images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE. SANTA FE, NOV. 2 - 9, 1991; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19911102), vol. -, pages 1736 - 1740, XP010058168 [X] 1,28 * page 1736, column 2, line 4 - line 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.1991.259213 | International search | [A]US6339652 (HAWKINS WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [A]US2004010397 (BARBOUR RANDALL L [US], et al) |