EP1898529 - BROADCAST RECEIVING APPARATUS, INTERFERENCE DETECTING APPARATUS AND INTERFERENCE DETECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiko Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishimachi, Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama 3508555 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Terukazu Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishimachi, Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama 3508555 / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756468.2 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006JP310212 | Priority number, date | JP20050188407 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005188407 | [2008/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000860 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898529 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04B1/26 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
H04B1/109 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/12] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSTRAHLUNGSEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, STÖRUNGSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND STÖRUNGSDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2008/11] | English: | BROADCAST RECEIVING APPARATUS, INTERFERENCE DETECTING APPARATUS AND INTERFERENCE DETECTING METHOD | [2008/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION DE DIFFUSION, APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D INTERFÉRENCE ET MÉTHODE DE DÉTECTION D INTERFÉRENCE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | Translation filed | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 29.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |