EP1900471 - SILVER-COATED BALL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neomax Materials Co., Ltd. 19-1, Minamisuita 2-chome Suita-shi Osaka 564-0043 / JP | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASADA, Ken, NEOMAX MATERIALS CO., LTD. 2-19-1, Minamisuita Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0043 / JP | 02 /
KIKUI, Fumiaki, NEOMAX MATERIALS CO., LTD. 2-19-1, Minamisuita Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0043 / JP | [2013/44] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
ASADA, Ken, NEOMAX MATERIALS CO., LTD. 2-19-1, Minamisuita Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0043 / JP | ||
02 /
KIKUI, Fumiaki, NEOMAX MATERIALS CO., LTD. 2-19-1,inamisuita Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0043 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756483.1 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006JP310227 | Priority number, date | JP20050156226 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005156226 | [2008/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126527 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900471 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/14, B22F1/02, B23K35/30, B23K35/40, H01L23/12, B23K35/02 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B23K35/02 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/18 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,US);
B23K35/3006 (EP,US);
B23K35/40 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/4853 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (KR);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L24/10 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1308 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13083 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13084 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13155 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1357 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13639 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01016 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15182 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15184 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0215 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0257 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10234 (EP,US);
H05K3/3463 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/1308, H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13147, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13155, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13639, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2008/12] | B23K35/14, B22F1/02, B23K35/30, B23K35/40, H01L23/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/37] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT SILBER BESCHICHTETE KUGEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/12] | English: | SILVER-COATED BALL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2008/12] | French: | BILLE REVETUE D'ARGENT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2013/41] |
Former [2008/12] | BILLE ARGENTEE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2007 | Translation filed | 21.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 20.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1370253 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]JP2000248303 (DOWA MINING CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO03040270 (OXONICA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * pages 4-5, lines 26-3 - page 9, lines 5-7; claims 2, 4,15 *; | [Y]WO2004030428 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005060831 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |