EP1890362 - CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMMI, Yoshinobu, @c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6008530 / JP | 02 /
TERANISHI, Hirotada, @c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6008530 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
HEMMI, Yoshinobu, c/o OMRON Corporation 801,Minamifudodo-cho,Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6008530 / JP | ||
02 /
TERANISHI, Hirotada, c/o OMRON Corporation 801,Minamifudodo-cho,Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6008530 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Wilhelms · Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Straße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Wilhelms . Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756490.6 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006JP310234 | Priority number, date | JP20050159583 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005159583 | [2008/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006129521 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890362 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890362 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/88, H01R12/62, H01R12/79, H01R12/77, H01R12/59 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H01R12/88 (EP,US);
H01R12/77 (KR);
H01R12/771 (EP,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,US);
H01R12/707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | H01R12/88, H01R12/62, H01R12/79, H01R12/77 | ||
Former IPC [2008/08] | H01R12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/29] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDER | [2008/08] | English: | CONNECTOR | [2008/08] | French: | CONNECTEUR | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2007 | Translation filed | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 03.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6280217 (LIN YI YAN [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 13 * * column 4, line 8 - line 18 *; | [A]US6319033 (MA HAO-YUN [TW]) [A] 1 * figure - * * column 3, line 51 - line 59 *; | [A]EP1311028 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] *; | [A]JP2003346948 (TAIKO DENKI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] *; | [E]US7147498 (GILLESPIE BRIAN J [US], et al) [E] 1 * abstract ** column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 9 *; | [E]EP1890361 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document * |