EP2000939 - PERSON ONESELF AUTHENTICATING SYSTEM AND PERSON ONESELF AUTHENTICATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. 7-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8388 / JP | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Makoto c/o Mitsubishi Research Institute DCS Co., Ltd. Shinagawa Seaside West Tower 4-12-2, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8506 / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Makoto c/o Mitsubishi Research Institute DCS Co., Ltd. Shinagawa Seaside West Tower, 4-12-2, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8506 / JP | ||
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Makoto Mit. Res. Inst. DCS Co., Ltd. Shinagawa Seas. W. Tow., 4-12-2, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo;1408506 / JP | Representative(s) | Weiss, Christian, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hohenstaufenstraße 7 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Weiss, Christian, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Weiss, Christian, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756843.6 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/50] | WO2006JP310923 | Priority number, date | JP20060089869 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006089869 | [2008/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110973 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000939 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2000939 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000939 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, G06F21/36 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/02] | G06F21/20, G06F21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/50] | G06F21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | PERSONEN-SELBST-AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM UND PERSONEN-SELBST-AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/50] | English: | PERSON ONESELF AUTHENTICATING SYSTEM AND PERSON ONESELF AUTHENTICATING METHOD | [2008/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AUTHENTIFICATION PERSONNELLE DE SOI-MÊME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION PERSONNELLE DE SOI-MÊME | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | Translation filed | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10171260.2 / EP2317457 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2006 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | IE | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | LU | 31.05.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6720860 (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 16 * * column 8, line 34 - line 55 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 51 ** claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2005010768 (LIGHT JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,2,3A-3F * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0028]; claims 1-8 * | Examination | US2004093527 |