EP2030571 - ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | For all designated states Media Cross Co., Ltd. 4-40-104 Minami-Motomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 160-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | ||
For all designated states Media Cross Co., Ltd 4-40-104 Minami-Motomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 160-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATOH, Jun-ichi c/o Shimadzu Corporation, 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | 02 /
ITOH, Masao c/o Media Cross Co., Ltd., 4-40-104, Minami-Motomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0012 / JP | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
KATOH, Jun-ichi c/o Shimadzu Corporation, 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
ITOH, Masao c/o MEDIA CROSS CO., LTD, 4-40-104, Minami-Motomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06757261.0 | 12.06.2006 | [2009/10] | WO2006JP311776 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144933 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030571 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/06 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B5/489 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61B8/4483 (EP,US);
G01S15/894 (EP,US);
G01S15/8945 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | A61B8/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2009/29] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-DIAGNOSEGERÄT | [2009/10] | English: | ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSIS DEVICE | [2009/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DIAGNOSTIQUE ECHOGRAPHIQUE | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | Translation filed | 02.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 13.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5152294 (MOCHIZUKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5623930 (WRIGHT J NELSON [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 7, line 7 - line 19 * * column 9, line 33 - line 42 * * figures 3,6 *; | [A]US5891039 (BONNEFOUS ODILE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 37 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6048317 (LANGGUTH ALFRED [US]) [A] 1-2 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]JP2000229078 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [X] 1-2 * figures 1,2a,2b * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * * claims 1,4 * [Y] 3; | [A]US2001016686 (OKADA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-2 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0170] ** figures 14-16 *; | [A]JP2004290408 (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2005028123 (SARAYA KK, et al) [Y] 3 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0092] *; | [A]JP2006115937 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0024]; figure 15 *; | [A] - AARON FENSTER ET AL, "3-D Ultrasound Imaging: A Review", IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (19961101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0739-5175, pages 41 - 50, XP011084747 [A] 1-2 * the whole document * |