EP1892051 - CERMET INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINDO, Tomoaki, c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678525 / JP | 02 /
KOMURA, Atsushi, c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678525 / JP | 03 /
TAKASHIMA, Hiroaki, c/o NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678525 / JP | 04 /
TANIUCHI, Toshiyuki, MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP. 1511, Furumagi, Jyoso-shi Ibaraki 3002724 / JP | 05 /
FUKUMURA, Masafumi, MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP. 1511, Furumagi Jyoso-shi, Ibaraki 3002724 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI, Kei, MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1511, Furumagi Jyoso-shi Ibaraki 3002724 / JP | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Martin Peter, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Jackson, Martin Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06757299.0 | 13.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006JP311864 | Priority number, date | JP20050173463 | 14.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005173463 | JP20050259169 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005259169 | JP20050259170 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005259170 | JP20050259171 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005259171 | JP20050303095 | 18.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005303095 | JP20050303096 | 18.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005303096 | [2008/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006134936 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892051 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, C22C27/04, C22C29/04, B22F7/00, B22F7/06, B23B27/00, B23B27/02 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
C22C29/04 (EP,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
C22C27/04 (EP,US);
C22C29/02 (KR);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1924 (EP,US);
Y10T407/22 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/10, B22F2201/20, B22F2201/11, B22F2201/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/09] | B23B27/14, C22C27/04, C22C29/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/30] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CERMET-EINSATZ UND SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2008/09] | English: | CERMET INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL | [2008/09] | French: | INSERT EN CERMET ET OUTIL DE COUPE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2007 | Translation filed | 14.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 15.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 23.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5460893 (TERUUCHI KIYOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 7 ** column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 30; tables 1,4 *; | [X]JPH091405 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2004292842 (TUNGALOY CORP) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * |