EP1869641 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE FOREGROUND BACKGROUND ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YELTON, Dennis J. 9520 Palomas Ave. NE Albuquerque, New Mexico 87109 / US | 02 /
PORTIGAL, Fred 1404 Jefferson Blvd. N.E. Albuquerque, New Mexico 87110 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
PORTIGAL, Fred 9520 Palomas Ave. NE Albuquerque, New Mexico 87109 / US | ||
02 /
YELTON, Dennis, J. 1404 Jefferson Blvd. N.E. Albuquerque, New Mexico 87110 / US | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Howson, Richard G.B. Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Howson, Richard G.B. Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06758198.3 | 24.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US11003 | Priority number, date | US20050107155 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 107155 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113054 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869641 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869641 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10036 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ADAPTIVE ANALYSE VON VORDER- UND HINTERGRÜNDEN | [2007/52] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE FOREGROUND BACKGROUND ANALYSIS | [2007/52] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREILS D'ANALYSE ADAPTATIVE D'AVANT-PLAN/ ARRIERE-PLAN | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2006 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | IT | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 24.03.2018 | LU | 24.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.03.2006 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X] - DONOVAN STEUTEL; MICHAEL E. WINTER; PAUL G. LUCEY, "Improved error mitigation in endmember unmuxung of hyperspectral images via image partitioning of target-lile spectral anomalies", ALGORITHMS AND TECHNOLOGIES FOR MULTISPECTRAL, HYPERSPECTRAL, AND ULTRASPECTRAL IMAGERY IX 21-24 APRIL 2003 ORLANDO, FL, USA, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng USA, (2003), vol. 5093, no. 1, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 390 - 397, XP002412906 [X] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.487471 |