EP1894250 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES HAVING VARYING ELECTRODE WIDTHS TO PROVIDE NON-UNIFORM GATE PITCHES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703-8475 / US | ||
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Dirve Durham, NC 27703-8475 / US | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states CREE MICROWAVE, LLC 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIRAM, Saptharishi 107 Timber Hitch Road Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/45] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06758302.1 | 10.04.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US13305 | Priority number, date | US20050157356 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: US 157356 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007001589 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894250 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894250 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/417, H01L29/423 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H01L29/41758 (EP,US);
H01L29/42316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTE MIT VARIIERENDEN ELEKTRONENBREITEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON UNGLEICHFÖRMIGEN GATE-TEILUNGEN UND DIESBEZÜGLICHEN VERFAHREN | [2008/10] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES HAVING VARYING ELECTRODE WIDTHS TO PROVIDE NON-UNIFORM GATE PITCHES AND RELATED METHODS | [2008/10] | French: | DISPOSITIFS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS À LARGEURS D ÉLECTRODES VARIABLES PRÉSENTANT DES PAS DE GÂCHETTE NON UNIFORMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 25.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2006 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/01] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0560123 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [X]US5850099 (LIU WILLIAM UEI-CHUNG [US]) [X] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [DX]US6534857 (MORSE ALFRED W [US]) [DX] 1-35 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH06310545 |