EP1874778 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING SALTS OF 4-[[5-[(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)CARBONYL]-2-METHYLPHENYL]AMINO]-5-METHYL-N-PROPYLPYRROLO[2,1-F][1,2,4]TRIAZINE-6-CARBOXAMIDE AND NOVEL STABLE FORMS PRODUCED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Soonjin 23 Country Club Way Demarest, New Jersey 07627 / US | 02 /
MALLEY, Mary F. 50 Merion Place Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 03 /
SHI, Zhongping 20 N. Wilson Way West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06758390.6 | 18.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US14504 | Priority number, date | US20050672255P | 18.04.2005 Original published format: US 672255 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006113682 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874778 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874778 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/53, A61P29/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 09.10.2007 | MK | 09.10.2007 | YU | 09.10.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SALZEN VON 4-[[5-[(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)CARBONYL]-2-METHYLPHENYL]AMINO]-5-METHYL-N-PROPYLPYRROLO[2,1-F][1,2,4]TRIAZIN-6-CARBOXAMID UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE NEUE STABILE FORMEN | [2008/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING SALTS OF 4-[[5-[(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)CARBONYL]-2-METHYLPHENYL]AMINO]-5-METHYL-N-PROPYLPYRROLO[2,1-F][1,2,4]TRIAZINE-6-CARBOXAMIDE AND NOVEL STABLE FORMS PRODUCED THEREIN | [2008/02] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE SELS DE 4-[[5-[(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)CARBONYL]-2-METHYLPHENYL]AMINO]-5-METHYL-N-PROPYLPYRROLO[2,1-F][1,2,4]TRIAZINE-6-CARBOXAMIDE ET NOUVELLES FORMES STABLES PRODUITES DANS CE PROCEDE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | IE | 18.04.2010 | LU | 18.04.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
LU | 18.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 18.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03090912 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 1-58* example 311 * |