EP1886369 - COMPACT SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lilliputian Systems, Inc. 36 Jonspin Road Wilmington MA 01887 / US | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEVITZ, Samuel, B. 24 Magnolia St. Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
FRANZ, Aleksander 6 Keenan Drive Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | 03 /
BARTON, Roger, W. PO Box 791 Grand Marais, MN 55604 / US | [2013/19] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
SCHAEVITZ, Samuel, B. 3430 Lake Chad Court Fremont, California 94555 / US | ||
02 /
FRANZ, Aleksander 6 Keenan Drive Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | |||
03 /
BARTON, Roger, W. PO Box 791 Grand Marais, MN 55604 / US | |||
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
SCHAEVITZ, Samuel, B. 3430 Lake Chad Court Fremont, California 94555 / US | ||
02 /
FRANZ, Aleksander 6 Keenan Drive Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | |||
03 /
BARTON, Roger, W. 39 Juniper Road Andover, Massachusetts 01810-2817 / US | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Kelly, Madeleine, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge IRL-Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06758699.0 | 27.04.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006US16108 | Priority number, date | US20050115980 | 27.04.2005 Original published format: US 115980 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006116638 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886369 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886369 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/12, H01M8/06 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H01M8/04067 (EP,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/0625 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (KR);
H01M8/1286 (EP,US);
H01M8/2432 (EP,US);
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2250/30 (EP,US);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | H01M8/02, H01M8/24, H01M8/12, H01M8/06, H01M8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2008/07] | English: | COMPACT SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL APPARATUS | [2008/07] | French: | APPAREIL COMPACT DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À OXYDE SOLIDE | [2012/49] |
Former [2008/07] | APPAREIL A PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDES | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012 | 30.04.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2006 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.04.2006 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0355420 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,14,15 * figure 9 *; | [X]US2001049039 (HALTINER KARL J [US]) [X] 1-4,14* figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1439594 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,14 * figures 2,5a,5b * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0047] , [0051] , [0071] , [0074] * | by applicant | EP0355420 |