EP1880418 - RECHARGEABLE DYE SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solaris Nanosciences, Inc. 321 South Main Street, Suite 102 Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWANDY, Nabil, M. 80 Beauchamp Drive Saunderstown, RI 02874 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06759402.8 | 09.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US17908 | Priority number, date | US20050679104P | 09.05.2005 Original published format: US 679104 P | US20050215678 | 29.08.2005 Original published format: US 215678 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006122114 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880418 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H01G9/2077 (EP,US);
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | H01L25/00, H01L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARE FARBSTOFFSENSIBILISIERTE SOLARZELLE | [2008/04] | English: | RECHARGEABLE DYE SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL | [2008/04] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE RECHARGEABLE SENSIBILISEE PAR APPLICATION D'UN COLORANT | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | 10.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0048212 (KURTH GLAS & SPIEGEL AG [CH], et al) [I] 1,2 * page 3, line 12 - page 8, line 17; figure 1 *; | [I]EP1087412 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0098]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2001004901 (YAMANAKA RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [I] 1,2* paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0122] *; | [I]EP1471546 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *; | [I] - A. HAGFELDT ET AL., "Verification of high efficiencies for the Gratzel-cell. A 7% efficient solar cell based on dye-sensitized colloidal TiO2 films", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS NETHERLANDS, (1994), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 481 - 488, XP002592178 [I] 5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5350644 (GRAETZEL MICHAEL [CH], et al); | [Y]US2004028875 (VAN RIJN CORNELIS JOHANNES MAR [NL], et al); | [Y]US2004161666 (HAAS DAVID P [US], et al); | [Y]US2003205268 (NAKAMURA YOSHISADA [JP], et al) |