EP1880464 - INTEGRATED ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVEN COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sullair Corporation 3700 E. Michigan Boulevard Michigan City, IN 46360-9990 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Jianping 1083 White Willow Lane Chesterton, IN 46304 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06759553.8 | 11.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US18225 | Priority number, date | US20050127550 | 12.05.2005 Original published format: US 127550 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006124509 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880464 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/00, F04C29/04, H02K9/12 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
F04C29/045 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | H02K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE, TR [2008/25] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER ELEKTROMOTORBETRIEBENER VERDICHTER | [2008/04] | English: | INTEGRATED ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVEN COMPRESSOR | [2008/04] | French: | COMPRESSEUR COMMANDE PAR MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE INTEGRE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK | 01.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2015 | 17.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2016 | 30.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/49] | 29.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02181091 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [Y] 7* abstract *; | [XYI]US5129798 (CRUM DANIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 32 - column 13, line 60; figures 1,2,8 * [Y] 2,5,7 [I] 8; | [Y]WO03006831 (ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER NV [BE], et al) [Y] 2,5 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 1; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5174740 (JANG SUNG-PIL [KR]); | [X]US5605045 (HALIMI EDWARD M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5129798 |