EP2023737 - BATTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MILLS MARKETING, INC. Number One General Mills Boulevard Minneapolis, Minnesota 55426 / US | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Weijie 3815 Scheuneman Rd. Gem Lake, Minnesota 55110 / US | 02 /
MODER, Gregg, J. 948 Lydia Drive Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | 03 /
SCHOENFUSS, Tonya, C. 4676 Curtis Ave. Nw Buffalo, Minnesota 55313 / US | 04 /
LEVIN, Liza 3735 Archer Lane N Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US | 05 /
PATTERSON, Debra, L. 3600 Comet Lane Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345 / US | 06 /
GREEN, Stephen 14925 43rd Pl. N. Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06759663.5 | 10.05.2006 | [2009/08] | WO2006US18423 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007130070 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023737 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/18, A21D10/02, A21D10/04, A23L1/0522 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A21D10/04 (EP,US);
A21D2/186 (EP,US);
A21D2/26 (EP,US);
A23L29/212 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | TEIGZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2009/08] | English: | BATTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING SAME | [2009/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PATE A FRIRE ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 06.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2783403 (GROUPE DANONE SA [FR]) [X] 1-18,20-23,27,28 * page 7, line 1 - line 21; examples 1-3 *; | [X]WO0237970 (CEBA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-18,20-23 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 6; example 1 *; | [X]WO9904640 (PILLSBURY CO [US]) [X] 1-18,20-23 * table 2 *; | [X]US4353932 (BONE DAVID P) [X] 1-18,20-23 * example III *; | [X]US3753734 (KAPLOW M, et al) [X] 1-18,20-23 * examples I-III *; | [X]WO03022062 (SANOVO FOODS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-17,20-23 * examples 1-6 *; | [X]US4154863 (EAPEN KUTTIKANDATHIL E [US], et al) [X] 1-17,20-23 * example 10 *; | [X]WO9851159 (PILLSBURY CO [US]) [X] 1-17,20-23 * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 2 *; | [A]US2001055638 (TAKASHIMA HIROE [JP]) [A] 1-18,20-23 * example 6 *; | [DA]EP0648421 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [DA] 13,20-23 * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 5, line 27 - line 33 *; | [E]WO2007019239 (GEN MILLS MARKETING INC [US], et al) [E] 1-18,20-23 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007019364 (GEN MILLS MARKETING INC [US], et al) [E] 1-18,20-23 * the whole document * | [X] - BOURQUIN, M. ET VOUGA, CH., Recettes Culinaires et Hygiène Alimentaire, LE LOCLE, IMPRESSIONS GLAUSER, (1984), XP002416467 [X] 1-18,20-23 * pages 287,322, * |