EP1888364 - DISPLAYING VEHICLE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bose Corporation The Mountain Framingham, MA 01701-9168 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states BOSE CORPORATION The Mountain Framingham Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLCOTT, Andrew 4 Lowell Ave., Apt. 2 Newtonville, MA 02460 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06760070.0 | 17.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US19194 | Priority number, date | US20050134562 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 134562 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006127378 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888364 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, G01C21/36 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G01C21/3626 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
G01C21/3688 (EP,US);
B60K2360/141 (EP,US);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGE VON FAHRZEUGINFORMATIONEN | [2008/08] | English: | DISPLAYING VEHICLE INFORMATION | [2008/08] | French: | AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS DANS UN VEHICULE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 20.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4412859 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 6,23 * abstract *; | [A]EP0794408 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [X]EP1080976 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,14-21,23,28-31,37-40,45-47 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017]; figures 2,9,10 *; | [X]EP1080974 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,14-16,18,20,21,24,25,28,29,31-33,36,38,40-42,44,46 * paragraph [0017]; figure - *; | [X]US6539289 (OGINO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-22,24-36,38-44,46,47 * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 36; figures 4,6,10 *; | [A]US6650345 (SAITO HUMIO [JP], et al) |