EP1888830 - POLYPROPYLENE FIBER FOR REINFORCEMENT OF MATRIX MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innegra Technologies, LLC 270 Feaster Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Innegrity, LLC 2131 Woodruff Road, No. 162, Suite 2100 Greenville, SC 29607 / US | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Innegrity, LLC 2131 Woodruff Road, No. 162 Suite 2100 Greenville SC 29607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIN, Brian, G. 8 New Forest Court Greenville, South Carolina 29615 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/08] | Schlief, Thomas P. Patentanwälte Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 06760611.1 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US21201 | Priority number, date | US20050149887 | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 149887 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006135574 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888830 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1888830 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1888830 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D02G3/00 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
D01F6/06 (EP,US);
C04B16/0633 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B28/14 (EP,US);
D01F6/30 (EP,US);
D01F6/46 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249927 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249932 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/386, C04B14/42, C04B14/48, C04B16/0633, C04B16/0641, C04B16/0691 (EP,US);
C04B28/14, C04B14/386, C04B14/42, C04B14/48, C04B16/0633, C04B16/0641, C04B16/0691 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENFASER ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG VON MATRIXMATERIALIEN | [2008/08] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE FIBER FOR REINFORCEMENT OF MATRIX MATERIALS | [2008/08] | French: | FIBRE DE POLYPROPYLENE POUR LE RENFORCEMENT DE MATERIAUX MATRICES | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2006 | AT | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | LU | 01.06.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6010786 (TAKAI YOUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-23 * column 2, line 11 - line 13; claims 1,5 * * column 4, line 22 - line 24 * * column 6, line 40 - line 42; table 2 *[I] 7 | International search | [Y]US2003082378 (RIEDER KLAUS-ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [Y]US2003044592 (PEREZ MARIO A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005019565 (MORIN BRIAN G [US], et al); | [Y]US4979992 (BACHE HANS H [DK]); | [A]US2001050032 (DRY CAROLYN M [US]); | [A]US6753081 (LOVETT JEFFREY B [US], et al) | by applicant | US6102999 | - M. AHMED, Polypropylene Fibers - Science and Technology, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1982), pages 192 - 203 |