EP1913378 - LC/MS BLENDS CONTAINING IONISING ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigma-Aldrich Production GmbH Industriestr. 25 9471 Buchs / CH | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMERT, Joachim Perreystr. 34 68219 Mannheim / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06761828.0 | 27.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006DE01304 | Priority number, date | DE20052011957U | 29.07.2005 Original published format: DE 202005011957 U | DE20062008638U | 31.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008638 U | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012319 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913378 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/72 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07K7/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8429 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | 21.01.2008 | BA | 21.01.2008 | HR | 21.01.2008 | MK | 21.01.2008 | RS | 21.01.2008 | Title | German: | IONISIERUNGSADDITIVE ENTHALTENDE LC/MS-BLENDS | [2008/17] | English: | LC/MS BLENDS CONTAINING IONISING ADDITIVES | [2008/17] | French: | MELANGES LC/MS CONTENANT DES ADDITIFS IONISANTS | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9924436 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 9, paragraph LAST *; | [X]WO2004087931 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 9, paragraph 1. *; | [PX]US2005171135 (MORK NIELS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-18 * paragraph [0059] *; | [X]WO2004090543 (VERNALIS CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-18 * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [X]US2004110740 (MARFAT ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-18 * paragraph [0170] * |