EP1917080 - PLAYGROUND DEVICE WITH MOTION DEPENDENT SOUND FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Play it Sound ApS c/o Innovation Lab Finlandsgade 20 8200 Århus N / DK | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGAARD, Peter Laurids Skaus Gade 15, 4 tv. DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | 02 /
POULSEN, Henrik Sommer Stenaldervej 117, st th DK-8220 Brabrand / DK | 03 /
KELLER, Mette Stubkjær Udsigten 17 DK-8654 Bryrup / DK | 04 /
NIELSEN, Jonas Gam Lundbyesgade 2, 1.tv. DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | 05 /
OLESEN, Tina Rosholm Falstersgade 46, 4th. DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Medenwaldt, Robin Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Medenwaldt, Robin Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 06761860.3 | 16.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006DK00449 | Priority number, date | DK20050001158 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: DK 200501158 | DK20050001316 | 21.09.2005 Original published format: DK 200501316 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007019861 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917080 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63G9/00, A63G11/00, A63G13/00, A63G15/00, A63G17/00, A63G19/00 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
A63G9/00 (EP,US);
A63G11/00 (EP,US);
A63G13/00 (EP,US);
A63G31/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | SPIELPLATZVORRICHTUNG MIT BEWEGUNGSABHÄNGIGER SCHALLRÜCKKOPPLUNG | [2008/19] | English: | PLAYGROUND DEVICE WITH MOTION DEPENDENT SOUND FEEDBACK | [2008/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TERRAIN DE JEUX PRODUISANT UN RETOUR SONORE DEPENDANT DU MOUVEMENT | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP13160559.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 23.04.2013 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6416381 (WALTER CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,54,1,3,54,1,3,54 * column 1, line 51 - line 65 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 31; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 51 - line 65 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 31; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 51 - line 65 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 31; figures 1-7 * [Y] 2,48,55,100,2,48,55,100,2,48,55,100; | [Y]WO2004004178 (MICRONAS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 2,48,55,100,2,48,55,100,2,48,55,100 * page 1, line 4 - line 27 * * page 1, line 4 - line 27 * * page 1, line 4 - line 27 *; | [A]US5861808 (LEHMANN ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1,1,1 * column 2, line 27 - line 55; figure 1 * * column 2, line 27 - line 55; figure 1 * * column 2, line 27 - line 55; figure 1 * | by applicant | US6416381 | WO2004004178 | US5861808 |