EP1901615 - FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2008/13] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER HIJDEN, Hendrikus Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
MAVROUDIS, N. Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier vanNoortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
PETERS, Henricus P. F. Unilever R&DVlaardingen Ol ivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Kan, Jacob Hendrik Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06762036.9 | 13.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006EP05691 | Priority number, date | EP20050076574 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05076574 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007006383 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901615 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0522, A23L1/29 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A23L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/13] | English: | FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING IT | [2008/13] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4770893 (KLUGE GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 46 - line 61 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4; example 1 *; | [X]GB2347840 (UNITED BISCUITS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10,12 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 24 *; | [X]RU2164759 ; | [A]JPS5179742 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 35, Database accession no. 2001-334305, XP002341734 & RU2164759 C1 20010410 (UNIV MOSC FOOD PRODN) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 35, Database accession no. 1976-65564X, XP002341735 & JPS5179742 A 19760712 (KANIE M) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |