EP1891711 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kostal Kontakt Systeme GmbH Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TITOKIS, Konstantinos Gutenbergstr. 5 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG An der Bellmerei 10 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG An der Bellmerei 10 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG An der Bellmerei, 10 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762041.9 | 14.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006EP05710 | Priority number, date | DE20051028037 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028037 | [2008/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006133919 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891711 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1891711 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/639 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
H01R13/6273 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US);
H01R33/7671 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2008/09] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/09] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | NL | 14.03.2012 | PL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SE | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | AT | 14.06.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | IE | 14.06.2012 | LU | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.06.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
LU | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.06.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.06.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 14.03.2012 | |
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 14.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9741623 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [Y] 8-12* abstract *; | [XY]DE10032234 (FCI AUTOMOTIVE DEUTSCHLAND GMB [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * [Y] 8-12 | by applicant | DE29724486U | DE10032234 |