EP1915498 - PROFILE HINGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Hahn GmbH & Co. KG Trompeterallee 162-170 41189 Mönchengladbach-Wickrath / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESSEN, Rainer Moltkestrasse 19 47799 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
STEINFELD, Ingo Heidackerstrasse 4 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
BÖGEL-PÖTTER, Jürgen Brühlstrasse 5b 41849 Wassenberg / DE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Kluin, Jörg-Eden Patentanwalt Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden Patentanwalt Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762252.2 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP06277 | Priority number, date | DE20052012153U | 29.07.2005 Original published format: DE 202005012153 U | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007014604 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915498 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915498 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/02, E05D7/04 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
E05D7/0423 (EP);
E05D5/023 (EP);
E05D7/043 (EP);
E05D2007/0461 (EP);
E05Y2600/32 (EP);
E05Y2600/322 (EP);
E05Y2600/61 (EP);
E05Y2600/622 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROFILBANDSYSTEM | [2008/18] | English: | PROFILE HINGE SYSTEM | [2008/18] | French: | SYSTEME A PROFILE ET A BANDE | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 29.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0965714 (HAHN GMBH & CO KG DR [DE]) [DA] * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029]; figures 4-7; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE20102813U (HEINE & SOHN ANUBA BESCHLAEGE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 25; figure 8; claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP1124032 (JUKEN SANGYO [JP]) [A] * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figures 5,6; tables 1-3 * |