EP1896303 - MEANS FOR FIXING A DRIVE MECHANISM OF A WIPER DEVICE TO A BODY SHELL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOISSAC, Jean-Paul 11, Résidence de la tour Girard F-86100 Chatellerault / FR | 02 /
PREDEAU, Serge 2, rue de la Branderie Saint-Sauveur F-86100 Chatellerault / FR | 03 /
COLLINET, Laurent Fontsemont F-86270 La Roche Posay / FR | 04 /
DELLA LIBERA, Marc 63 Rue Honoré de Balzac F-86530 Naintre / FR | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Rosolen-Delarue, Katell Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle ZA L'Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand, CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Rosolen-Delarue, Katell Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Propriété Industrielle Z.A. de l'Agiot 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Application number, filing date | 06762285.2 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006EP06335 | Priority number, date | FR20050006638 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506638 | [2008/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000354 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896303 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04, B60S1/58 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
B60S1/0447 (EP,US);
B60S1/04 (KR);
B60S1/58 (KR);
B60S1/583 (EP,US);
B60S1/0444 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4459 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS EINER WISCHERVORRICHTUNG AN EINEM KÖRPERGEHÄUSEELEMENT | [2008/11] | English: | MEANS FOR FIXING A DRIVE MECHANISM OF A WIPER DEVICE TO A BODY SHELL ELEMENT | [2008/11] | French: | FIXATION D'UN MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ESSUYAGE SUR UN ELEMENT DE STRUCTURE DE CAISSE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2853606 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [X] 1,6,11,12,15,19,28,33 * page 7, line 17 - page 21, line 21; figure - *; | [A]US2001005084 (PONZIANI RICHARD L [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0038]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP1407946 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,28 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 3,4 * |