EP1896983 - A MEMORY ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTI-PROCESSOR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/32] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Bingfeng Ke Ji Xin Cun 3-2-502 Hangzhou 310012 / CN | 02 /
KIM, Suk, Jin Sait, Mt. 14-1, Nogseo-dong Giheung-gu Younggin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR | 03 /
ALLAM, Osman Schapenstraat 50 B-3000 Leuven / BE | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 06762309.0 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006EP06375 | Priority number, date | US20050695506P | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 695506 P | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007003370 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896983 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896983 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/76, G06F13/16 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G06F13/1657 (EP);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F13/16 (KR);
G06F15/76 (EP,KR);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERANORDNUNG FÜR MEHRPROZESSORSYSTEME | [2008/11] | English: | A MEMORY ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTI-PROCESSOR SYSTEMS | [2008/11] | French: | AGENCEMENT MEMOIRE POUR SYSTEMES MULTIPROCESSEURS | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10012097.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.11.2010 | EP10184465.2 / EP2317446 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2006 | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | LV | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | ES | 21.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 10.08.2011 | |
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5214769 (UCHIDA NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 14,21 * figures 2,4 * * claim 8 * * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 22 *[A] 22-25; | [X]EP0623880 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,12,15-17 * figures 1,2,6 * * page 4, line 16 - line 40 * * page 8, line 10 - line 14 * * page 10, line 20 - line 21 *; | [XA]WO0237284 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,12,15-17 * figures 2-5 * * abstract * * page 11, line 11 - line 21 * * page 12, line 30 - line 35 * [A] 3,10; | [A]US6564304 (VAN HOOK TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 12 * column 4, line 43 - line 51 * * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003196058 (RAMAGOPAL HEBBALALU S [US], et al) [A] 15,16 * figure 3 *; | [XA]WO03100618 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 14,21-23 * figures 1,10 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 3 * * page 8, line 29 - line 33 * * page 6, line 8 - line 12 * [A] 24,25 |