EP2060087 - TOPOLOGY HIDING OF MOBILE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYDNELL, Gunnar Silleskärsgatan 47 S-421 59 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
ROMMER, Stefan Skogsrydsgatan 7 S-4126 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2009/28] |
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
RYDNELL, Gunnar Silleskärsgatan 47 S-421 59 Västra Frölunda / SE | ||
02 /
GOLDBECK-LÖWE, Tomas Vikingagatan 5 S-112 42 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
ROMMER, Stefan Skogsrydsgatan 7 S-4126 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | Representative(s) | Vejgaard, Christian Ericsson AB Patent Unit Antennas and Microwaves Lindholmspiren 11 417 56 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Vejgaard, Christian Ericsson AB Patent Unit Antennas and Microwaves Lindholmspiren 11 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06762353.8 | 03.07.2006 | [2009/21] | WO2006EP06453 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008003334 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060087 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/0407 (EP,US);
H04L63/0892 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPOLOGIEVERBERGUNG VON MOBILAGENTEN | [2009/21] | English: | TOPOLOGY HIDING OF MOBILE AGENTS | [2009/21] | French: | DISSIMULATION DE TOPOLOGIE D'AGENTS MOBILES | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03041358 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 5 - page 12, line 4; figure 1 * * page 14, line 23 - page 21, line 30; figures 3,4 * * page 23, line 17 - page 33, line 9 *; | [X]EP1560378 (ALCYONE HOLDING S A [LU]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022] - [0052]; figures 4-8 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0089] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0125]; figures 16-18 *; | [A] - SHNEYDERMAN ET AL, "Mobile VPNs for next generation GPRS and UMTS networks", WHITE PAPER LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, (2000), page 15PAGES, XP002963845 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |