EP1910148 - ADJUSTABLE STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | [2015/24] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEHR, Robert Weiherring 120 FL-9493 Mauren / LI | 02 /
SCHOLTEN, Michael Herawies 42 6723 Blons / AT | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
GALEHR, Robert Weiherring 120 FL-9493 Mauren / LI | ||
02 /
SCHOLTEN, Michael Schlössleweg 22 A-6840 Götzis / AT | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski-Honke Postfach 100254 45002 Essen / DE | [2012/03] |
Former [2010/52] | Adams, Steffen ThyssenKrupp AG Patentabteilung Q1, 5. Etage ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Adams, Steffen ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG Legal - Patents Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Adams, Steffen ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG Legal and Compliance, Patents Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762687.9 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP07086 | Priority number, date | DE20051034952 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034952 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009760 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910148 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910148 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1910148 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE LENKSÄULE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2008/16] | English: | ADJUSTABLE STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/16] | French: | COLONNE DE DIRECTION REGLABLE DESTINEE A UN VEHICULE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2011
01.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE ZF Systemes de Direction Nacam, S.A.S. Z.I. Sud, Route de Blois 41100 Vendome / FR Opponent's representative Novagraaf Technologies, et al, et al Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE ZF Systemes de Direction Nacam, S.A.S. Z.I. Sud, Route de Blois 41100 Vendome / FR Opponent's representative Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | 03.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.10.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.07.2013 | Appeal received No. T1461/13 | 30.08.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.10.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.06.2013 | Appeal received No. T1461/13 | 20.08.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.10.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | AT | 19.07.2011 | LU | 19.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2015/20] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
AT | 19.07.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
AT | 19.07.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2714647 (NACAM [FR]) [X] 1-3,7-11 * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 7 * * figures 2-6 *; | [X]FR2778704 (LEMFORDER NACAM SA [FR]) [X] 1* figures 3-6 *; | [X]WO2004085225 (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14 * figures 7-10 *; | [X]EP1468895 (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 14 *; | [LPX]EP1612120 (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [LPX] 1-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0057] - [0060] * | Opposition | WO9839195 | US6357318 | US6357317 | EP1245472 | US2003025315 | US6848716 |