EP1913356 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE STABILITY AND/OR BENDING STRENGTH OF MASTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LGA Beteiligungs GmbH Tillystrasse 2 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMBURG, Sven Köhlerstr. 6 90530 Wendelstein / DE | 02 /
JOST, Günther Schlesierstrasse 10 91746 Weidenbach / DE | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
HOMBURG, Sven Oberer Kirchensteig 7 90455 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
JOST, Günther Schlesierstrasse 10 91746 Weidenbach / DE | |||
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
HOMBURG, Sven Oberer Kirchensteig 7 90455 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
JOST, Günter Schlesierstrasse 10 91746 Weidenbach / DE | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762785.1 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP07285 | Priority number, date | DE20051038033 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038033 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017090 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913356 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M5/00, G01M7/00, G01M7/08 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01M5/0058 (EP,US);
G01M7/00 (EP,US);
G01M7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/35] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG DER STAND- UND/ODER BIEGEFESTIGKEIT VON MASTEN | [2008/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE STABILITY AND/OR BENDING STRENGTH OF MASTS | [2008/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR VERIFIER LA STABILITE ET/OU LA RESISTANCE A LA FLEXION DE POTEAUX | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 11.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10300947 (MH TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-12,16,17,24-27,29-31 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2695206 (DUNE TRAVAUX SPECIALISES [FR]) [X] 1,30 * the whole document *; | [X]US5621172 (WILSON JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 1,30 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10008201 (REINERS CHRISTA [DE]) [X] 1,30 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1630537 (REINERS CHRISTA [DE]) [PX] 1,30 * the whole document * |