EP1877294 - STEERING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A REAR AXLE STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/31] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIEL, Lothar An der Tann 16 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
NEUMANN, Ulrich Ringstrasse 76 64360 Rossdorf / DE | [2008/03] | Application number, filing date | 06763071.5 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006EP61932 | Priority number, date | DE20051020420 | 02.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005020420 | DE20061020487 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006020487 | [2008/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117344 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1877294 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877294 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/14 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B60G7/003 (EP);
B62D7/14 (KR);
B62D17/00 (EP);
B62D7/00 (KR);
B62D7/146 (EP);
B60G2202/42 (EP);
B60G2204/419 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/32] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE HINTERACHSLENKUNG | [2008/03] | English: | STEERING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A REAR AXLE STEERING SYSTEM | [2008/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION, CONÇU EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE DIRECTION DE ROUE ARRIERE | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2001130427 ; | [XY]JPS62251277 ; | [A]DE2948181 (AUWAERTER GOTTLOB GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15* page 6, line 5 - page 14, line 23; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]US4695069 (KUROKAWA RYOGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,12,15 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 24; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13,14; | [A]DE3736229 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 33; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]DE10011142 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,12,14 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 55; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13,15; | [AY]DE10064585 (WOELK ADALBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008]; figure -; claims 1-26 * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13-15; | [XY]DE20313103U (TRW FAHRWERKSYST GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,12,14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0017]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13,15 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001130427 A 20010515 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,12,14 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13,15 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880419), vol. 012, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 687), & JP62251277 A 19871102 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4,7,12,15 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,8-11,13,14 |