EP1888194 - NEW STRIPPER CONFIGURATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHYLENE OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEKMAN, Willem, Johan Oceaanpad 16 NL-2614 XA Delft / NL | 02 /
BOONS, Peter Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
MIEDEMA, Wiebren, Age Chemieweg 25 NL-4782 SJ Moerdijk / NL | 04 /
REKERS, Dominicus, Maria Badhuisweg NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2015/45] |
Former [2010/07] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/08] | Cramwinckel, Michiel Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services Postbus 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06763103.6 | 10.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006EP62187 | Priority number, date | EP20050252851 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05252851 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006120207 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888194 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1888194 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/38, B01D3/14, C07D301/32 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
C07D301/32 (EP,KR,US);
B01D3/38 (EP,KR,US);
B01D3/14 (KR);
B01D3/143 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUE STRIPPERKONFIGURATION ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETYHLENOXID | [2008/08] | English: | NEW STRIPPER CONFIGURATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHYLENE OXIDE | [2008/08] | French: | NOUVELLE CONFIGURATION DE COLONNE DE DISTILLATION INVERSE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'OXYDE D'ETHYLENE | [2015/30] |
Former [2008/08] | NOUVELLE CONFIGURATION DE COLONNE DE DISTILLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'OXYDE D'ETHYLENE | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2006 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | GB | 10.05.2016 | IE | 10.05.2016 | LU | 10.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.05.2006 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 10.05.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.05.2006 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 10.05.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
GB | 10.05.2016 | ||
IE | 10.05.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4134797 (OZERO BRIAN J) [X] 1,13,19,21-25,31-36 * column 23, line 14 - line 18; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0870753 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 19 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6551465 (VAN ZILE CHARLES P [US], et al) [X] 11,18 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4033617 (COCUZZA GIOACCHINO, et al) [A] 9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3140153 (HUCKINS JR HAROLD A) [A] 13 * column 4, line 18 - line 24 * | Examination | DE19703627 | US3418338 | US4041131 | US2414371 | GB1409604 | GB1180822 | DE2200926 | by applicant | US4134797 | EP0870753 | US6551465 | US4033617 | US3140153 | DE19703627 | US3418338 | US4041131 | US2414371 | GB1409604 | GB1180822 | DE2200926 | - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (1980), vol. 9, pages 443 - 447 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1987), vol. A 10, page 104,105 |