EP1913335 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DIRECTING A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUECHER, Andreas Friedr.-Ebert-Str. 46 37520 Osterode / DE | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 06763452.7 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP62830 | Priority number, date | DE20051035413 | 28.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005035413 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012513 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913335 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01C21/3629 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM FÜHREN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2008/17] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DIRECTING A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE GUIDER UN VEHICULE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 05.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19854399 (MANNESMANN VDO AG) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 12 * * column 4, line 14 - line 27 * * column 4, line 35 - line 59 *; | [X]EP1528362 (HARMAN/BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0011] , [0014] , [0035] , [0036] * |