EP1913690 - ELECTRONIC APPLIANCE FOR TRIGGERING AUDIO SIGNALS AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMME AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jünger Audio-Studiotechnik GmbH Justus-Von-Liebig-Str. 7 12489 Berlin / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÜNGER, Herbert Niederlausitzstr. 9 14738 Zeuthen / DE | [2010/11] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
JÜNGER, Herbert Verlängerte Werderstrasse 15 12524 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Schneider, Henry, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Schneider, Henry, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06763678.7 | 13.06.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP63155 | Priority number, date | DE20052012816U | 08.08.2005 Original published format: DE 202005012816 U | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017304 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913690 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H03G7/002 (EP,US);
H03G7/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT ZUR AUSSTEUERUNG VON AUDIOSIGNALEN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2008/17] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPLIANCE FOR TRIGGERING AUDIO SIGNALS AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMME AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2008/17] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE POUR REGLER DES SIGNAUX AUDIO, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CORRESPONDANT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT CORRESPONDANT LISIBLE PAR UN ORDINATEUR | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005147262 (BREEBAART DIRK J [NL]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0031] , [0045] - [0069]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5524060 (SILFVAST ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 5; figures 2,4,7A-7D,8 * * column 11, line 22 - column 13, line 13 *; | [X]GB2179810 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figures 1-4,6 *; | [X]US2004002313 (PEACE ALLAN [AU], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0060] - [0063] - [0090] , [0111]; figures 2,4,6 *; | [X]US2004264714 (LU PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0039] - [0055]; figure 6 *; | [X]GB2000945 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figure 3 *; | [X]WO9847224 (TELEX COMMUNICATIONS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figure 2 * |