EP1911050 - Transformer with electrical switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/16] | ELECTRIC COMPONENT | ||
[2015/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINDEISEN, Jörg Wilsdruffer Ring 14 01169 Dresden / DE | [2008/16] | Application number, filing date | 06763988.0 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP63735 | Priority number, date | DE20051032017 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005032017 | DE20051032016 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005032016 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003595 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911050 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911050 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/14, H01H9/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
H01F27/14 (EP,US);
H01H9/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Transformator mit elektrischem Schalter | [2015/03] | English: | Transformer with electrical switch | [2015/03] | French: | Transformatuer comprennant un commutateur électrique | [2015/03] |
Former [2008/16] | ELEKTRISCHES BAUTEIL | ||
Former [2008/16] | ELECTRIC COMPONENT | ||
Former [2008/16] | COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2006 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | AT | 30.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | IE | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | LU | 30.06.2015 | FR | 17.08.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GB | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 30.06.2006 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 17.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GB | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 17.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GB | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 17.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GB | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GB | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE912366 (AEG) [A] * page 2, lines 30-52,82-116; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2915720 (JOSEF MUELLER, et al) [A] * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]DE1279833 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-3,9,13 * column 4, lines 7-38; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,15; | [YA]DE2515192 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK) [Y] 4,5 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 1-19; | [A]DE2835311 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG) [A] * abstract *; | [A]DE3240724 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] * abstract * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 32 *; | [YA]EP0957496 (ABB TRASFORMATORI S P A [IT]) [Y] 15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0031] * [A] 1-19; | [XY]WO0241336 (ABB OFFSHORE SYSTEMS AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-3,8,13,14,16 * abstract * * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, lines 17-36 * [Y] 4,5,15 |