EP1929164 - EXPANDER ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSCHBAUMER, Josef Kuffarn 9 A-3643 Maria Laach / AT | 02 /
GOBEC, Georg Oedt 197 8330 Feldbach / AT | 03 /
GAMSJAEGER, Norbert Dreistetterstrasse 16 A-2721 Bad Fischau / AT | 04 /
BADER, Benno Penk 83 2632 Greifenbach / AT | 05 /
GRUBER-NADLINGER, Thomas Asparnstrasse 22 A-3442 Langenrohr / AT | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
KERSCHBAUMER, Josef Kuffarn 9 A-3643 Maria Laach / AT | ||
02 /
GOBEC, Georg Rebengasse 36/a4 A-2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | |||
03 /
GAMSJAEGER, Norbert Dreistetterstrasse 16 A-2721 Bad Fischau / AT | |||
04 /
BADER, Benno Hauswaldgasse 10 A-2620 Neunkirchen / AT | |||
05 /
GRUBER-NADLINGER, Thomas Asparnstrasse 22 A-3442 Langenrohr / AT | Application number, filing date | 06764139.9 | 12.07.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006EP64130 | Priority number, date | DE20051044958 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005044958 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007033843 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929164 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929164 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C13/02, F16C13/00, D21F1/40, D21G1/02, B65H27/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
B65H23/0251 (EP,US);
D21F1/40 (EP,US);
D21G1/0213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREITSTRECKWALZE | [2008/24] | English: | EXPANDER ROLLER | [2008/24] | French: | ROULEAU DEPLISSEUR | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2006 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | AT | 12.07.2013 | GB | 12.07.2013 | IE | 12.07.2013 | LU | 12.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 12.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IE | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
AT | 12.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IE | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IE | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
GB | 12.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3676909 (TUOMAALA JORMA A K) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,13-16,18,24-28,31 * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 59; figure - * [I] 19-23,29,32; | [XI]GB2060821 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,13-15,17,18,30,31 * page 1, line 121 - page 2, line 114; figure 1 * [I] 19-26,32; | [XI]DE19945156 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9,27-29,31 * column 5, line 28 - line 52; figure 3b * [I] 19-26,32; | [A]DE2832457 (KOLLER RUDOLF) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 4; figures 1,7 *; | [A]US1868860 (VON REIS LAMBERT) [A] 31,32 * figure - * | by applicant | US3676909 | DE19927897 | DE102004045407 |