EP1912958 - SUBSTITUTED MALONONITRILE COMPOUNDS FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Michael Lutherstr. 2 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
BASTIAANS, Henricus, Maria, Martinus Bartholomaeus-Arnoldi-Str. 35 61250 Usingen / DE | 03 /
LANGEWALD, Jürgen Beethovenstrasse 5 68165 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
OLOUMI-SADEGHI, Hassan 12105 Pawley's Mill Circle Raleigh, Nc 27614 / US | 05 /
CULBERTSON, Deborah, L. 6400 Vintage Ridge Lane Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 06764279.3 | 01.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP64902 | Priority number, date | US20050706079P | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 706079 P | EP20050019052 | 01.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05019052 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017414 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912958 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D271/12, C07D215/12, C07D285/14, A01N43/82, A01N43/78, C07D263/56, C07D333/52, A01P7/04, A01P5/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/42 (EP,US);
A01N37/34 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
C07D215/12 (EP,US);
C07D263/56 (EP,US);
C07D271/12 (EP,US);
C07D277/64 (EP,US);
C07D285/14 (EP,US);
C07D333/58 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE MALONSÄURENITRILVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG TIERISCHER SCHÄDLINGE | [2008/17] | English: | SUBSTITUTED MALONONITRILE COMPOUNDS FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS | [2008/17] | French: | COMPOSES DE MALONITRILE SUBSTITUE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES ANIMAUX NUISIBLES | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYX]WO02089579 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [DY] 1-6 * table 1, compound no.37 intermediate 24 on p.84;;; claims 1-10 * [X] 7-23; | [DY]WO2004006677 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [DY] 1-23 * claims 1-4 *; | [DY]EP1555259 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DY] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO2005068432 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [DY] 1-23 * examples 28,29; claims 16-18 *; | [DA]JPH06256278 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD) [DA] 1-5 * compound 1b, page (5) *; | [Y]WO2005068423 ; | [DY]JP2004099597 | [DA] - BEILSTEIN, (20050422), Database accession no. BRN: 9867681, XP002362618 [DA] 1-5 * the whole document * | [ ] - WU, MING-SI ET AL, "Cobalt-catalyzed cyclotrimerization of diynes with norbornenes in one efficient step", TETRAHEDRON , 60(44), 10005-10009 CODEN: TETRAB; ISSN: 0040-4020, (2004), XP004580203 [ ] * table 1, entry 11: side-product 5-(2,2-dicyano-pent-4-ynyl)-indan-2,2-dicarbonitrile * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2004.08.021 | [DA] - YOKOYAMA, MASAHIRO ET AL, "Realization of the synthesis of .alpha.,.alpha.-disubstituted carbamylacetates and cyanoacetates by either enzymatic or chemical functional group transformation, depending upon the substrate specificity of Rhodococcus amidase", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY , 15(18), 2817-2820 CODEN: TASYE3; ISSN: 0957-4166, (2004), XP004575055 [DA] 1-5 * compound 1i in scheme 2, p.2819 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetasy.2004.04.047 | [DA] - SHIM, JAE-GOO ET AL, "Catalytic and highly regiospecific carbon-carbon bond formation at .alpha.-position of Michael acceptor by palladium complex", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS (CAMBRIDGE, UNITED KINGDOM) , (8), 852-853 CODEN: CHCOFS; ISSN: 1359-7345, (2002), XP002362588 [DA] 1-5 * table 1, compound 7e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b201545p | [DA] - NAKAMURA, HIROYUKI ET AL, "Palladium-Catalyzed Alkoxyallylation of Activated Olefins", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 120(27), 6838-6839 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1998), XP002362589 [DA] 1-5 * table 1, product 3e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja980959a | [DA] - DOMINGO, L. R. ET AL, "A theoretical study of the selectivity for the domino [5+2]/[4+2] cycloadditions of .gamma.-pyrones bearing tethered alkenes with substituted 1,3-butadienes", TETRAHEDRON , 57(26), 5597-5606 CODEN: TETRAB; ISSN: 0040-4020, (2001), XP004247097 [DA] 1-5 * scheme 6, compounds 14 and 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)00464-1 | [DA] - WESTFAHL, J. C. ET AL, "Vinylidene cyanide. VI. The aluminum chloride catalyzed reaction with tert-alkanes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 77, 936-9 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1955), XP002362590 [DA] 1-5 * 2-Naphthylmethyl-(methyl)-malonitrile (XVII), p.939 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01609a041 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 57, Database accession no. 2005-563927, XP002399563 & WO2005068423 A1 20050728 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * abstract * | [DY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 28, Database accession no. 2004-299646, XP002403056 & JP2004099597 A 20040402 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [DY] 1-23 * abstract * |