EP1893462 - METHOD FOR THE ANTICORROSIVE TREATMENT OF HOLLOW BODIES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC STRUCTURE TREATED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD, AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING THE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Nationale des Chemins de Fer Français 34, rue du Commandant René Mouchotte 75014 Paris / FR | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUENARD, Thierry 4, Chemin Vaudebanne F-10100 Romilly sur Seine / FR | 02 /
BOULANGER, Jean-Claude 8, route de Mery F-10170 Mesgrigny / FR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/36] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, Rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Bloch & Gevers 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06764750.3 | 08.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006FR01298 | Priority number, date | FR20050005848 | 09.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0505848 | [2008/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006131650 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893462 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893462 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/18 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B61D17/18 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/22 (KR);
C23F11/08 (EP,US);
C23F11/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, PL, SE [2008/28] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KORROSIONSSCHUTZBEHANDLUNG VON HOHLKÖRPERN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEMÄSS DEM VERFAHREN BEHANDELTEN METALLISCHEN STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFRECHTERHALTEN DER STRUKTUR | [2008/10] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ANTICORROSIVE TREATMENT OF HOLLOW BODIES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC STRUCTURE TREATED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD, AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING THE STRUCTURE | [2008/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ANTI-CORROSION DES CORPS CREUX, PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE STRUCTURE METALLIQUE TRAITEE SELON LE PROCEDE ET PROCEDE DE MAINTENANCE DE LA STRUCTURE | [2012/25] |
Former [2008/10] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ANTI-CORROSION DES CORPS CREUX, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UNE STRUCTURE MÉTALLIQUE TRAITÉE SELON LE PROCÉDÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE MAINTENANCE DE LA STRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 10.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/21] | SE | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]USH1976H (LAMBRAKOS SAMUEL G [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 25; figure 1 * [A] 10; | [Y]GB972405 (BOMBRINI PARODI DELFINO SPA) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * page 2, line 1 - line 69; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE10335746 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2185196 (CONOCO INC) [A] 1,2,8,9 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 63; figures 1-3 * | Examination | WO9719033 | by applicant | WO9719033 |