EP1907097 - SEPARATOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Hannifin Limited Parker House 55 Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead HP2 4SJ / GB | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANE, Brian 83 Sullivan Walk Hebburn, Tyne & Wear NE31 1YW / GB | 02 /
BITTLE, Stephen 3 The Grove, Darras Hall Ponteland, Northumberland NE20 9HQ / GB | 03 /
TROWSDALE, Ray 12 Millfield, Templetown Consett, Co. Durham DH8 7NZ / GB | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765056.4 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006GB02727 | Priority number, date | GB20050015266 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515266 | GB20050024181 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0524181 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007012823 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907097 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907097 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/06 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
B01D45/06 (EP);
B01D45/16 (EP);
B04C5/103 (EP);
B04C5/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRENNVORRICHTUNG | [2008/15] | English: | SEPARATOR ASSEMBLY | [2008/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE SEPARATEUR | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10319134 (SAMSUNG GWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [X] 1-8 * figure 4 *; | [X]WO03030702 (ARCELIK AS [TR]; DURST FRANZ [DE]; SEKER DENIZ [TR]; TATAR HAKAN [TR];) [X] 1-8 * figure 3 *; | [PX]WO2006013331 (DOMNICK HUNTER LTD [GB]; PEARSON JOHN [GB]; BITTLE THOMAS STEPHEN [GB]) [PX] 1-8 * figures 1,19 *; | [PX]WO2006013333 (DOMNICK HUNTER LTD [GB]; PEARSON JOHN [GB]; BITTLE THOMAS STEPHEN [GB]) [PX] 1-8 * figures 1,19 * |