EP1907532 - BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Nottingham University Park, University Boulevard Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Andrew, Institute of Genetics The University of Nottingham, Queen's Med. Centre Nottingham NG7 2UH / GB | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Keith, Div. of Animal Physiology Sch. ofBioscience, Sutton Bonington Campus Loughborough, Leicestershire LE12 5RD / GB | 03 /
ALBERIO, Ramiro, Div. of Animal Physiology Sch. of Biosciences, Sutton Bonington Campus Loughborough, Leicestershire LE12 5RD / GB | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Wainwright, Jane Helen Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wainwright, Jane Helen Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Thomas, Philip John Duval Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765082.0 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006GB02754 | Priority number, date | GB20050015006 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515006 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010287 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907532 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907532 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C12N5/16 (EP,US);
C12N5/0603 (KR);
A61K35/56 (KR);
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A61K35/65 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C12N15/8773 (EP,US);
C12N5/0609 (KR);
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N2501/605 (EP,US);
C12N2502/04 (EP,US);
C12N2506/00 (EP,US);
C12N2517/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | C12N5/06, A61K35/56, C12N5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | 18.01.2008 | BA | 18.01.2008 | HR | 18.01.2008 | MK | 18.01.2008 | RS | 18.01.2008 | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE MATERIALIEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2008/15] | English: | BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF | [2008/15] | French: | MATÉRIAUX BIOLOGIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1391503 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]) [X] 1-43 * claims 1-25 * * examples A-C * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - JOHNSON ANDREW D ET AL, "Regulative germ cell specification in axolotl embryos: A primitive trait conserved in the mammalian lineage.", PHILOSOPHICAL TRANSACTIONS OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON B BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20030829), vol. 358, no. 1436, ISSN 0962-8436, pages 1371 - 1379, XP002399630 [A] 1-43 * page 1373 * * page 1375 * * page 1376 - page 1377 * * page 1378, column 1 * * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rstb.2003.1331 | [A] - HANSIS C ET AL, "Nuclear Reprogramming of Human Somatic Cells by Xenopus Egg Extract Requires BRG1", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE,, GB, (20040824), vol. 14, no. 16, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1475 - 1480, XP004548528 [A] 1-43 * figures 1,2 * * page 1478 - page 1479, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2004.08.031 | [DA] - BACHVAROVA ROSEMARY F ET AL, "Gene expression in the Axolotl germ line: Axdazl, Axvh, Axoct-4, and Axkit", DEVELOPMENTAL DYNAMICS, (200412), vol. 231, no. 4, ISSN 1058-8388, pages 871 - 880, XP002399631 [DA] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dvdy.20195 | [A] - MCGANN C J ET AL, "MAMMALIAN MYOTUBE DEFIFFERENTIATION INDUCED BY NEWT REGENERATION EXTRACT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20011120), vol. 98, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13699 - 13704, XP001069019 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.221297398 | [A] - GURDON J B, "The use of Xenopus oocytes and embryos as a route towards cell replacement", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCES (BANGALORE), (200502), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0250-5991, pages 11 - 14, XP002399632 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02705145 | by applicant | EP1391503 | - NICHOLS ET AL., CELL, (1998), vol. 95, pages 379 - 391 | - CHAMBERS, CLONING STEM CELLS, (2004), vol. 6, pages 386 - 391 | - JOHNSON ET AL., PHIL. TRANS. ROYAL. SOC. LON., (2003), vol. 358, pages 1371 - 9 | - MAKIN ET AL., TECHNIQUE, (1990), vol. 2, pages 295 - 301 |