EP1926969 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING WALL THICKNESSES OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUGH, Gerald, William 52 Brackens Lane Alvaston Derby DE24 0AP / GB | 02 /
WHITESIDE, Dean 5 The Leascroft Ravenstone Leicestershire LE67 2BL / GB | 03 /
ORCHARD, Nicholas, Barrington 22 Henleaze Park Drive Henleaze Bristol, BS9 4LH / GB | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765230.5 | 08.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006GB02927 | Priority number, date | GB20050018153 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518153 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007028941 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926969 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926969 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B17/02 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G01B17/02 (EP,US);
G01B21/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | G01B21/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER WANDSTÄRKEN VON OBJEKTEN | [2008/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING WALL THICKNESSES OF OBJECTS | [2008/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE D ÉPAISSEUR DE PAROI | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 08.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08022396.9 / EP2040027 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2002128790 (WOODMANSEE DONALD [US]) [X] 15,17 * paragraphs [0018] - [0051] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,11,12,18,19 [Y] 1,5,6,9,10,13,14,16; | [Y]WO2004033991 (STOTZ FEINMESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,5,6,9,10,13,14,16 * page 9, line 4 - page 15, line 17; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1526356 (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,5,6,9,10,13,14,16 * paragraphs [0050] - [0058] * * figures 1,3,14 *; | [XA]US2005166413 (CRAMPTON STEPHEN J [GB]) [X] 1,5,9,13,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0390] - [0397] *[A] 2,6,10-12,14,17-19 |