EP1903932 - AN APPARATUS TO MEASURE THE INSTANTANEOUS PATIENTS' ACUITY VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/51] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAEED, Mohammed 292 Vasser Street, Apt. D4 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
NIELSEN, Larry 7 Thistle Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 03 /
ALI, Walid 29 Candlewood Court Briarcliff Manor, NY 10520 / US | 04 /
FRASSICA, Joseph P.o. Box 241 Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 05 /
ESHELMAN, Larry 62 Linden Avenue Ossining, NY 10562 / US | 06 /
ZONG, Wei 23 Scenic Drive, Apt. N Croton On Hudson, NY 10520 / US | 07 /
ABDALA, Omar 90-2 Alder Street Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06765731.2 | 13.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006IB51888 | Priority number, date | US20050692754P | 22.06.2005 Original published format: US 692754 P | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136972 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903932 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903932 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN VON MOMENTANEN WAHRNEHMUNGSFÄHIGKEITSWERTEN EINES PATIENTEN | [2008/14] | English: | AN APPARATUS TO MEASURE THE INSTANTANEOUS PATIENTS' ACUITY VALUE | [2008/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DU DEGRE D'ACUITE INSTANTANEE DU PATIENT | [2010/31] |
Former [2008/14] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DEGRE D'ACUITE INSTANTANE DE PATIENT | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IT | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | IE | 13.06.2011 | LU | 13.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.06.2011 | ||
LU | 13.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.06.2011 | ||
LU | 13.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0808603 (NESTOR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LT [IL]) [X] 1-7,11,14-21,25,28-32 * column 7, line 8 - column 12, line 53 *; | [A]US6067467 (JOHN ERWIN ROY [US]) [A] 1-32* claim 24 *; | [X]US2004039262 (BARDY GUST H [US]) [X] 1,3,4,15-18,29,30,32 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0076] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005006969 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-32 * page 6, line 9 - page 9, line 9 * | by applicant | EP0808603 | US2004039262 |