EP1905017 - A METHOD FOR GRADUALLY CLOSING DOWN A FOCUS CONTROL LOOP OF AN OPTICAL DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAYMAKERS, Jeroen, A., L., J. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06765835.1 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006IB52042 | Priority number, date | EP20050105863 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05105863 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007004095 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905017 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905017 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085, G11B7/095 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B7/085 (KR);
G11B7/095 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHRITTWEISEN SCHLIESSEN EINES FOKUSSTEUERUNGSKREISES EINES OPTISCHEN ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2008/14] | English: | A METHOD FOR GRADUALLY CLOSING DOWN A FOCUS CONTROL LOOP OF AN OPTICAL DRIVE SYSTEM | [2008/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE FERMETURE GRADUELLE D'UNE BOUCLE DE COMMANDE DE FOCALISATION D'UN SYSTEME D'ACTIVATION OPTIQUE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | IE | 23.06.2009 | LU | 23.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
LU | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
LU | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
IE | 23.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4989194 (AOI SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH0540941 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [AD]WO0143125 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002097643 (KADLEC RON J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002101800 (KUBOTA MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2003091833 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12* figure 5 *; | [A]US2003123344 (FUJIUNE KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004103234 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |