EP1955226 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER FOR MANIPULATING A DENTAL VIRTUAL MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/33] | METHOD FOR MANIPULATING A DENTAL VIRTUAL MODEL | ||
[2022/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | ||
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Cadent Ltd. 17 Ha'Taasiya Street, Fl. 3 Or Yehuda 60408 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPELMAN, Avi 41 Hadekel Street 55900 Ganei Tikva / IL | 02 /
TAUB, Eldad 11 Topaz Street 71908 Reut / IL | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Leach, Sean Adam, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/14] |
Former [2012/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Banfi, Paolo, et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06766123.1 | 10.07.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006IL00796 | Priority number, date | US20060349124 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: US 349124 | US20050699499P | 15.07.2005 Original published format: US 699499 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007010524 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955226 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955226 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40, A61C13/00, A61C5/77, G16H50/50, G16H40/63 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/34 (US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
A61C9/004 (US);
G06F30/00 (US);
G06T19/20 (US);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2004 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49567 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | G06F19/00, A61C5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND COMPUTER ZUM MANIPULIEREN EINES VIRTUELLEN DENTALMODELLS | [2022/22] | English: | METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER FOR MANIPULATING A DENTAL VIRTUAL MODEL | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT DE MANIPULER UN MODÈLE VIRTUEL DENTAIRE | [2022/22] |
Former [2008/33] | VERFAHREN ZUM MANIPULIEREN EINES VIRTUELLEN DENTALMODELLS | ||
Former [2008/33] | METHOD FOR MANIPULATING A DENTAL VIRTUAL MODEL | ||
Former [2008/33] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE MANIPULER UN MODELE VIRTUEL DENTAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 10.09.2020 | Appeal received No. T2011/20 | 07.12.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP20212313.9 / EP3809419 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2019 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 09.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | LU | 10.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/18] |
Former [2024/14] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0069357 (ALIGN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 5* page 20, line 5 - line 13 *; | [XPI]EP1607041 (CADENT LTD [IL]) [XP] 1-3 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0127] * * figure 14 * [I] 4-13 | International search | [X]US6174168 (DEHOFF BARRY [US], et al); | [A]US2004158342 (WOLF DIETRICH [DE], et al) | Examination | US2005080503 | by applicant | EP1607041 |